Everyone is welcome to farewell Stephen Colyer (My Dad) on Monday 19/03/2018 at 12 Midday at Walkers Crematorium and Memorial Gardens in Frederickton.
If you know Dad from The Golf club, Bowles or The Marine Rescue Annette(My Mum) and I would love you to wear your uniforms or if your a die hard Bulldog supporter like Dad wear your jerseys!
James HAWKINS New South Wales Police Force Regd. Service # 3981 Rank: Constable Stations: ?, Central Police Station ( 1 Station / 1 Division ) – Death Service: From 5 May 1881 to 2 July 1881 = 1+ MONTHS Service Awards: ? Born: 14 September 1860 in The Hills Shire, NSW Died on: Saturday 2…
LIST OF PERSONS KNOWN TO HAVE COMMITTED SUICIDE DUE TO THE WOOD ROYAL COMMISSION 15 June 1995 – Unnamed 32 year old Detective from Annandale Police Station who jumped to his death from a 7th floor building. – Peter James McGRATH – 15 June 1995 12 April 1997 – -Policeman Clinton Moller found…
Richard George HAGAN Late of ? New South Wales Police Force [alert_yellow]Regd. # 8330[/alert_yellow] Rank: Probationary Constable – appointed 20 February 1956 Senior Constable – appointed 20 February 1967 Stations: ? Service: From ? ?pre February 1956 ? to ? ? ? = ? years Service Awards: No find on It’s An Honour Born: 5…
William Charles FAHEY – QPM, OAM New South Wales Police Force aka Bill Husband of Elizabeth ( deceased 25 December 2016 ) ( late of 178 Ocean Vista Drive, Maroochy River 4561, Queensland ) Police College, Penrith – Class # 024 Regd. # 7042 Rank: Probationary Constable – appointed 13 August 1951 (…
Joyce Clarine GARLAND – widow of Arnold Late of Sequoia Place, Inverell New South Wales Police Force Rank: Police Wife Stations: ? Awards: No find on It’s An Honour Born: ? ? ? Died on: ? June 2017 Age: 88 Cause: ? Event location: ? Event date: ? Funeral date: Thursday 22 June 2017 @…
Lawrence Roy WATSFORD formerly of Pillar Valley, late of South Grafton New South Wales Police Force [alert_yellow]Regd. # 9226[/alert_yellow] Rank: Probationary Constable – appointed 2 March 1959 Sergeant 3rd Class – appointed 17 August 1976 Final rank = ? Stations: ? Service: From ? ? pre March 1959? to ? ? ? = ? years…