David ODONOHUE
David ODONOHUE
Australian Federal Police
Senior Constable
Died: 23 November 2013
Brain tumour
Further information sought re this man.
Further information sought re this man.
Stephen NAYLOR New South Wales Police Force Regd. # ? Constable 1st Class ? Stations: Burwood Service: From ? to ? Awards: ? Born: ? Died: about 1979 Cause: Murdered Location of event: ? Funeral date: ? Funeral location: ? Grave location: ? [alert_red]Stephen is NOT mentioned on the Police Wall of Remembrance[/alert_red] …
Douglas Patrick PHILP AKA ? Late of ? “possible” relation in ‘the job’: ? NSW Police Training Centre – Redfern – Class # 087 New South Wales Police Force Regd. # 10041 Rank: Commenced Training at Redfern Police Academy on Monday 29 May 1961 ( aged 20 years, 5…
Constable Eric Peter OLIFF Motor Vehicle Accident Wyong 18 April, 1962 On 18 April, 1962 Constable Oliff was riding a Police Public Safety Bureau motor cycle on wide load escort duties. Just north of Wyong the cycle was involved in a collision with another motor vehicle. The constable was thrown through the air, losing…
vii. JONATHON PATEN Senior Constable Paten was stationed at Queanbeyan. For some period of time Paten was exhibiting clear signs of mental illness that were recognised at the time by the Police Psychologist. Paten resigned from the NSW Police and committed suicide. The Coroner found that it was more convenient for the NSW…
Stephen Brian CONNOR AKA STEVE Late of Ballina NSW Redfern Police Academy Class # 156 New South Wales Police Force [alert_yellow]Regd. # 17704[/alert_yellow] Rank: Probationary Constable – appointed 12 September 1977 Constable – appointed 12 September 1978 Senior Constable – appointed 12 September 1986 Leading Senior Constable – appointed ? ? ? Final Rank =…
Kerry John WEEKES New South Wales Police Force Redfern Police Academy Class # 116 Regd. # 13419 Rank: Probationary Constable – appointed 16 September 1968 Constable – appointed ? ? ? Constable 1st Class – appointed 16 September 1973 Senior Constable – appointed 16 September 1977 Sergeant 3rd Class – appointed 8 September 1984…